Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc. filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against A G A Electric Inc, Best Value Glass, Inc., Bowman, Brian Alan; Dba : Abc Heating & Air Conditioning, Dirkes, Mark William; Dba : M D Coatings & Specialty Finishes, Integrity Flood Response Inc; Dba : Gold Coast Flood Restorations, (total of 8) See All represented by Geller, Michael S, Mcgonigle, Timothy Desiderio, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with William Y Wood presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial253 days |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Answer filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Original Summons (CROSS) filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Order - Other (Recommendation and ORDER on Discovery) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-05-27T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 245]
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Demurrer (10/30/2020) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 266]
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/30/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-10-30T00:00:00Proposed Order (1/22/21) submitted by Floyd, John Thompson received but not filed on 01/06/2021.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (1/22/21) filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (1/22/2021) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objections (1/22/2021) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Answer (to CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 375]
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Answer filed by A G A Electric Inc.
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2019-03-28T00:00:00Answer (to CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC..
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Answer filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Answer filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Best Value Glass, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00Association of Attorney submitted by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC rejected on 01/14/2019.
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Answer (to CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/07/2019 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 398]
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice - Other (OF PENDING ACTION) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC..
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Case reassigned from Frazier,Ronald to Dahlquist,Robert effective 12/29/2018
Date: 2018-12-29T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Answer filed by Bowman, Brian Alan.
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/01/2019 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Answer filed by J & L Insulation, Inc.. Refers to: S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Answer (to Cross-Complaint) filed by Best Value Glass, Inc..
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by A G A Electric Inc.
Date: 2019-05-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (3/4/2022) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/03/2021 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Answer (to CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2019-06-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Answer (CROSS-COMP) filed by Best Value Glass, Inc..
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Attachment filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Answer (CROSS-COMP) filed by A G A Electric Inc.
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (2/16/22) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Answer filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 95]
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Answer (TO CROSS COMPLAINT) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Motion - Other (07/12/2019) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2019-05-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Answer filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/12/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/08/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-12-08T00:00:00Objections (1/22/21) filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice - Other (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Answer filed by Best Value Glass, Inc..
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Objections (12/08) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (12/20/2023) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00Statement - Other (1/22/2021) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Proposed Order (01/12/2021) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Joinder to Opposition filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Floyd, John Thompson. Refers to: Floyd, John
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Opposition - Other (1/22/2021) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (12/20/2023) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Wilson, Gracie; S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (1/22/21) filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (01/12/2021) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Special) filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 01/22/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (2/11 SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Proposed Order (1/22/2021) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Opposition - Other (1/22/2021) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (1/22/2021 - APPENDIX OF EXHIBITS) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in support of Opposition 1/22/21) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Craig A Weeber 1/22/2021) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-12-29T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (7/23/21) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Best Value Glass, Inc.; A G A Electric Inc.
Date: 2023-12-29T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (3/4/2022) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/16/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (7/23/21) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Limited Scope Representation 2/16/22) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 08/27/2021 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (3/4/2022) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (3/4/2022) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-12-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Bowman, Brian Alan.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2022-05-25T00:00:00Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Limited Scope Representation 7/23/21) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Bowman, Brian Alan.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Notice - Other filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2021-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 02/11/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 03/04/2022 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Proposed Order filed by Bowman, Brian Alan.
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition 9/9/22) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2022-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by J & L Insulation, Inc.; J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-09-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 09/09/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (Motion to Sever) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Errata filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2024-01-19T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/10/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-10T00:00:00Joinder to Opposition filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc.; J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Wilson, Gracie.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (ISO Motion - 2/17/23) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/23/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (1/27/23) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-09-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-10-17T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (and ORDER) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Wilson, Gracie.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Declaration - Other (ISO Motion 5/5/2023) filed by Wilson, Gracie.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Proposed Order (2/17/23) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 01/13/2023 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Proposed Order (5/5/2023) submitted by Wilson, Gracie received but not filed on 01/24/2023.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Limited Scope Representation) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Remote Appearance filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2022-02-14T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (3/25/2022) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motion to Dismiss Cross-Complaint [6/24/22]) filed by Bowman, Brian Alan.
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00Motion - Other (Motion to Augment Expert Designation [3/17/23]) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2023-01-19T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Brian D Woolfall ISO Mtion to Dismiss [6/24/22]) filed by Bowman, Brian Alan.
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Order - Other (Approving Stipulated Settlement) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2023-01-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (and ORDER) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Proposed Order (6/24/22) submitted by Bowman, Brian Alan received but not filed on 04/07/2022.
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/08/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Joinder to Motion and Supporting Declarations (6/24/22) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (5/26/2023) filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Separate Statement (ISO MSJ 5/26/2023) filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2023-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Proposed Order (03/20/23) submitted by BERMAN, JACQUELINE received but not filed on 03/17/2023.
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/20/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (1/27/23) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Motion for Severance (1/27/23) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (12/8/2023 - appendix of exhibits) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-09-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/24/2023 03:00:00 PM.
Date: 2023-03-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (12/8/2023) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-09-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (12/8/2023) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2023-01-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (1/27/23) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2022-12-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Separate Statement (12/8/2023) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-09-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (12/8/2023) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-09-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 10/06/2023 02:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-10-06T00:00:00Separate Statement filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-10-27T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Limited Scope Representation) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2023-01-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2023-01-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (5/5/2023) filed by Wilson, Gracie.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-10-05T00:00:00Proposed Order (4/14/23) submitted by Scott, Jeffrey David received but not filed on 01/26/2023.
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-11-06T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE. Refers to: Wilson, Gracie
Date: 2023-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Continued Hearing filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-11-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2023-12-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 11/03/2023 02:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-11-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 02/17/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (12/08) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2023-03-13T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2023-12-13T00:00:00Notice to Appear filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2023-12-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 12/08/2023 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2023-12-08T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (12/8/2023) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-09-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2023-12-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/20/2023 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2023-12-20T00:00:00Exhibit List filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-20T00:00:00Notice - Other filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2023-12-20T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-11-02T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (ISO MSJ 5/26/2023) filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (05/01/2020) filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Joinder to Opposition (05/01/2020) filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 216]
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc.; J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-07-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/13/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 06/24/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (2/17/23) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2022-12-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Answer filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Answer filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2019-11-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Answer filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Opposition - Other (1/27/23) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (4/14/23) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Answer filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc.. Refers to: S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-10-01T00:00:00Answer filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2020-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Answer (to FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT) filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Answer filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (4/14/23) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Separate Statement (4/14/23) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc.; J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2019-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Proposed Order filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 12/06/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 12/18/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-12-18T00:00:00Answer filed by MD COATINGS INC.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number (WITH PFOOF OF SERVICE) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2020-12-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (4/14/23) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-01-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-06-05T00:00:00Objections filed by Wilson, Gracie; S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2020-06-09T00:00:00Answer filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other (ISO MSJ 5/26/2023) filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-03-09T00:00:00Opposition - Other (1/22/21) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (1/22/21) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (05/01/2020) filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Answer filed by A G A Electric Inc.
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00Answer filed by Wilson, Gracie.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Reply (10/30/2020) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Opposition - Other (1/22/21) filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (1/22/21) filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Declaration - Other (1/22/2021) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Limited Scope Representation 03/20/23) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (1/22/21) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other (1/22/2021 - EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Answer filed by Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (01/12/2021) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (01/12/2021) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Objections filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-10-27T00:00:00Objections (1/22/21) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by J & L Insulation, Inc.; J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-11-08T00:00:00Witness List filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (12/20/2023) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (03/20/23) filed by BERMAN, JACQUELINE.
Date: 2023-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-10-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2023-10-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc. received but not filed on 12/01/2023.
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2024-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-21T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-12-07T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Continued Hearing filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-10-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00Witness List filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2023-12-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by INTEGRITY FLOOD RESPONSE INC.
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00Exhibit List filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2023-12-28T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2023-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-12-27T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due (and Order to Continue Hearing) filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2023-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2024-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2024-01-05T00:00:00Opposition - Other (03/22/24) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2024-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2024-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 02/21/2024 02:30:00 PM.
Date: 2024-02-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other (Reply to Oppo MIL No.1) filed by A G A Electric Inc.
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other (Reply to Oppo MIL No.1) filed by Best Value Glass, Inc..
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/26/2024 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2024-03-26T00:00:00Declaration in Opposition to filed Motion (03/22/24) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2024-03-11T00:00:00Opposition - Other filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2024-03-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2024-01-05T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 790]
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2024-01-03T00:00:00Joinder to Opposition (03/22/24) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2024-03-12T00:00:00Joinder to Opposition (03/22/24) filed by Best Value Glass, Inc..
Date: 2024-03-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2024-03-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2024-03-11T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2024-03-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/08/2024 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2024-01-08T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2024-05-07T00:00:00Joinder to Opposition (2/21/24) filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2024-02-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (03/22/24) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2024-03-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/22/2024 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2024-01-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2024-03-29T00:00:00Association of Attorney filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: 2024-05-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by A G A Electric Inc.
Date: 2024-02-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 05/24/2024 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2024-05-24T00:00:00Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/29/2024 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in 2103 Kevin A. Enright.
Date: 2024-05-24T00:00:00Case reassigned from Dahlquist,Robert to Wood,William effective 03/30/2024
Date: 2024-03-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Floyd, John Thompson.
Date: June 26, 2024Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: June 20, 2024Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Scott, Jeffrey David.
Date: 2022-02-15T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (and ORDER) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2024-01-22T00:00:00Separate Statement (ISO Motion 5/5/2023) filed by Wilson, Gracie.
Date: 2023-01-24T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC; Wilson, Sean.
Date: 2023-12-21T00:00:00Separate Statement (12/08) filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2023-12-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00Joinder to Opposition filed by Best Value Glass, Inc..
Date: 2024-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by P.W. Stephens Environmental, Inc..
Date: 2024-01-04T00:00:00Opposition - Other (2/21/24) filed by Alta Roofing & Waterproofing, Inc..
Date: 2024-02-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by J & L Insulation, Inc..
Date: 2024-01-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 12/18/2023 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2023-12-18T00:00:00Opposition - Other (12/20/2023) filed by S&J BUILDERS AND RESTORATION SERVICES INC.
Date: 2023-12-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.