Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Castro, Rebeca, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Garcia, Yvette, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Michael D. Washington presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time15 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested denied with prejudice. | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 10/12/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-24 .
Judge: Michael D. Washington |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
The Hearing on Restraining Order was rescheduled to 10/12/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in N-24 before at North County.
Judge: Michael D. Washington |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/12/2018 01:30:00 PM. | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Castro, Rebeca. Refers to: Garcia, Yvette | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 10/19/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-24 .
Judge: Michael D. Washington |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department N-24.
Judge: Michael D. Washington |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Castro, Rebeca. Refers to: Garcia, Yvette | |
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order filed by Castro, Rebeca. Refers to: Garcia, Yvette |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.