Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Safeway Inc, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Rafferty, James, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Richard S. Whitney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time54 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (personal as to WV 130 restraining order after hearing) filed by Safeway Inc. | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Safeway Inc. | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against James Rafferty was granted. | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 11/13/2018 08:30:00 AM. | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Workplace Violence Restraining Order After Hearing filed by Safeway Inc. Refers to: Rafferty, James | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service filed by Safeway Inc. | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Request - Other filed by Safeway Inc. | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Restraining Order continued pursuant to Court's motion to 11/13/2018 at 08:30AM in Department C-61.
Judge: Richard S. Whitney |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order - Other filed by Safeway Inc. | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/24/2018 08:30:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.