We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company A S O Araceli Sanchez ,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Timourian, Jack H ,
against
Griffith, Jeremy James ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
with Richard S. Whitney presiding.
Filing Date
September 25, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 23, 2021
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Plaintiffs
Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company A S O Araceli Sanchez
Case Events for
Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company A S O Araceli Sanchez v. Griffith, Jeremy James
Date
Type
Description
May 17, 2019
Docket Event
OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.
May 17, 2019
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney was vacated.
May 10, 2019
Docket Event
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/10/2019 09:30:00 AM.
Get Document
May 10, 2019
Docket Event
Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Get Document
May 10, 2019
Docket Event
Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Get Document
May 10, 2019
Docket Event
Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 06/14/2019 at 09:30AM before Judge Richard S. Whitney.
May 10, 2019
Docket Event
OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 09:30AM before Judge Richard S. Whitney.
April 25, 2019
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Griffith, Jeremy James .
April 25, 2019
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company a/s/o Araceli Sanchez.
Get Document
April 25, 2019
Docket Event
Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed without prejudice as to Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company a/s/o Araceli Sanchez.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.