Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-4, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude, Raymond A, against Kennedy, David J, Russo, Denise J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to N-26 effective 02/16/2019.
Date: 2019-02-16T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does (DOES 1-15) filed by National collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-4.
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00Case reassigned from N-26 to N-03 effective 01/09/2021.
Date: 2021-01-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.