Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Denny, Gloria J, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
Date: January 11, 2020Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 25, 2018Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Denny, Gloria
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Denny, Gloria
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank USA NA. Refers to: Denny, Gloria
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Capital One Bank USA NA.
Date: March 08, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.