Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Department Stores National Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Collins, Emily, against Flordeliza, Armenia, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Richard E. L. Strauss presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Time To Trial189 days |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time369 days |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Department Stores National Bank. Refers to: Flordeliza, Armenia
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Department Stores National Bank.
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service filed by Department Stores National Bank. Refers to: Flordeliza, Armenia
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Department Stores National Bank. Refers to: Flordeliza, Armenia
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Answer filed by Flordeliza, Armenia.
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (answer) filed by Flordeliza, Armenia. Refers to: Department Stores National Bank
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Denied - Payment Plan) filed by Flordeliza, Armenia.
Date: 2018-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Department Stores National Bank.
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice - Other (Trial) filed by Department Stores National Bank.
Date: April 05, 2019Trial Brief (Plaintiff's Trial Brief) filed by Department Stores National Bank.
Date: June 19, 2019Case reassigned from 903 to Richard Strauss effective 02/01/2019
Date: 2019-02-01T00:00:00Motion to Deem Facts Admitted filed by Department Stores National Bank.
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 06/21/2019 08:50:00 AM.
Date: June 21, 2019Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/29/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: June 21, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.