Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide, Flint C, against Gaxiola, John, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Edlene C. McKenzie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 24, 2018Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by LVNV Funding LLC.
Date: March 17, 2021Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Refers to: Gaxiola, John
Date: September 21, 2018Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
Date: January 11, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Refers to: Gaxiola, John
Date: September 21, 2018Original Summons filed by LVNV Funding LLC. Refers to: Gaxiola, John
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.