Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, Usa, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Atkinson, Jessica N, against Barrientos, Juan, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Jacqueline M. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time140 days |
Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK, USA. Refers to: BARRIENTOS, JUAN
Date: January 11, 2019Original Summons filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK, USA. Refers to: BARRIENTOS, JUAN
Date: September 13, 2018Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: January 31, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK, USA. Refers to: BARRIENTOS, JUAN
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK, USA. Refers to: BARRIENTOS, JUAN
Date: January 07, 2019Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 24, 2018Declaration - Other (NON MILITARY STATUS) filed by CAPITAL ONE BANK, USA.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 1]
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 2]
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.