Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Express National Bank; Fka : American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Micheal, Lina, against Pierce, Calvin D, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time81 days |
Affidavit - Other filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: November 16, 2018Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 24, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express National Bank. Refers to: Pierce, Calvin
Date: September 21, 2018[A document for ROA# 3]
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: December 11, 2018Affidavit - Other filed by American Express National Bank.
Date: October 19, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.