Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wang, Zhen Dong, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Achord, David T, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Katherine Bacal presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial196 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions508 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time508 days |
Original Summons filed by Wang, Zhen Dong. Refers to: Bayaua, Joseph; De La Cruz, Kristian
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Complaint filed by Wang, Zhen Dong. Refers to: Bayaua, Joseph; De La Cruz, Kristian
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wang, Zhen Dong. Refers to: Bayaua, Joseph; De La Cruz, Kristian
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Answer filed by Bayaua, Joseph Patrick.
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (& Demand for Jury) filed by Bayaua, Joseph Patrick.
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by Bayaua, Joseph Patrick. Refers to: De La Cruz, Kristian
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Original Summons (Cross-Complaint) filed by Bayaua, Joseph Patrick. Refers to: De La Cruz, Kristian
Date: 2018-10-29T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by De La Cruz, Kristian.
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Answer filed by De La Cruz, Kristian.
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Answer filed by De La Cruz, Kristian.
Date: 2018-12-20T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by De La Cruz, Kristian.
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Bayaua, Joseph Patrick.
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by De La Cruz, Kristian.
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Wang, Zhen Dong.
Date: 2019-03-20T00:00:00Advance Trial Review Order filed by Wang, Zhen Dong; De La Cruz, Kristian.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 09/27/2019 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Mediator Selection Form filed by Bayaua, Joseph Patrick.
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: October 15, 2019Order for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed by Bayaua, Joseph Patrick.
Date: October 08, 2019Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: October 15, 2019Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Wang, Zhen Dong; De La Cruz, Kristian.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/05/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: February 11, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.