Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Emvv Financial Management Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Schneider, Adam, against Cardoso, Josefina, Gomez, Leonardo, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time44 days |
Original Summons filed by EMVV Financial Management LLC. Refers to: Gomez, Leonardo; Cardoso, Josefina
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 15]
Date: October 15, 2018Writ of Possession issued.
Date: October 18, 2018Writ of Possession Returned - Unsatisfied filed by EMVV Financial Management LLC.
Date: November 02, 2018Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: October 15, 2018Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by EMVV Financial Management LLC.
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.