Merchants Acceptance Corporation,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
O'Bryant, Eurik,
against
De Alba, Anali,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Edlene C. McKenzie presiding.
Case Details for
Merchants Acceptance Corporation v. De Alba, Anali
Case Events for
Merchants Acceptance Corporation v. De Alba, Anali
Date
Type
Description
October 06, 2020
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Merchants Acceptance Corporation and against De Alba, Anali for $ 1557.63, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 375.00, interest: $ 1208.34, prejudgment costs: $ 250.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 3390.97.
October 06, 2020
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Court filed by Merchants Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: De Alba, Anali
August 07, 2020
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Court (NOT ENTERED) submitted by Merchants Acceptance Corporation rejected on 08/07/2020. Refers to: De Alba, Anali
July 31, 2020
Docket Event
The default filed by Merchants Acceptance Corporation was entered as to De Alba, Anali on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees . Override feature used.
July 31, 2020
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (with Supporting Documents) filed by Merchants Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: De Alba, Anali
January 11, 2020
Docket Event
Notice of Case Reassignment SD Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
November 26, 2018
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Merchants Acceptance Corporation. Refers to: De Alba, Anali
September 20, 2018
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed.