Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bernard A Xavier Trustee Of The Xavier Family Trust Dated June 25 2001, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mckinley, James R, against Barron, Itzayana, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Matthew C. Braner presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions13 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time170 days |
[Another document for ROA# 13]
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Bernard A Xavier Trustee of the Xavier Family Trust dated June 25 2001.
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Bernard A Xavier Trustee of the Xavier Family Trust dated June 25 2001.
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Writ of Possession issued.
Date: 2018-10-09T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.