Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Camelot Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stelzer, Cynthia D, against Carr, Md, Kenneth W, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time355 days |
Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 08/13/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: August 13, 2021Request for Entry of Default filed by Camelot Investments, LLC. Refers to: Carr, MD, Kenneth
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by Camelot Investments, LLC.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Camelot Investments, LLC.
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/22/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Camelot Investments, LLC. Refers to: Carr, MD, Kenneth
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Camelot Investments, LLC. Refers to: Carr, MD, Kenneth
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment issued.
Date: March 08, 2019Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Complaint filed by Camelot Investments, LLC. Refers to: Carr, MD, Kenneth
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court filed by Camelot Investments, LLC. Refers to: Carr, MD, Kenneth
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Bench Warrant of Attachment Returned filed by Camelot Investments, LLC.
Date: September 13, 2021Proof of Service filed by Camelot Investments, LLC.
Date: July 08, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.