Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Martin, Randall, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Fahr, Maxine ; Aka : Fahr, Barbara, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Michael D. Washington presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time27 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Order After Hearing by Mail filed by Martin, Randall. Refers to: Fahr, Maxine | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-CHO) filed by Martin, Randall. Refers to: Fahr, Maxine | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/12/2018 08:30:00 AM. | |
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against MAXINE FAHR aka BARBARA FAHR was granted. | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Martin, Randall. Refers to: Fahr, Maxine | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department N-24.
Judge: Michael D. Washington |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 10/12/2018 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-24 .
Judge: Michael D. Washington |
|
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) filed by Martin, Randall. Refers to: Fahr, Maxine | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (GRANTED) filed by Martin, Randall. Refers to: Fahr, Maxine | |
September 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing filed by Martin, Randall. Refers to: Fahr, Maxine |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.