Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deguevara, Hilda, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against The Arc Of San Diego, Murphy, James, Firstgroup America Inc, First Transit Inc, First Student Inc, (total of 5) See All represented by Quayle, Robert H Iv, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions442 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time454 days |
Original Summons filed by The Arc of San Diego.
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by The Arc of San Diego.
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/12/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: September 12, 2019Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Case reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018
Date: 2018-12-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/22/2019 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: September 12, 2019Case Management Statement filed by Franco, Rogelio.
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Answer filed by The Arc of San Diego.
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2019-07-09T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2019-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: December 04, 2019Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/03/2019 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (NOT ENTERED) filed by Franco, Rogelio.
Date: October 30, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.