Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Konfino, Gil, Next Level Motors, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Cline, Brian K; Perkins, Nia K, against General Motors Llc, represented by Flores, Marlene Kristen; Gasparyan, Haik, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Cycle Time548 days |
Declaration - Other filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Konfino, Gil.
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Proposed Order (03/08/2019) filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (ORDER GRANTED) filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 19]
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Demurrer (03/08/2019) filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2018-11-06T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-14T00:00:00Complaint filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors. Refers to: General Motors LLC
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Konfino, Gil.
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Motion to Strike (03/08/2019) filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (03/08/2019) filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/15/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Proposed Order (5/10/19) filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: February 22, 2019Statement - Other (5/10/19) filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (5/10/19) filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: April 09, 2019E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: 2019-02-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Exhibit List filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors.
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by General Motors LLC.
Date: March 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Next Level Motors. | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Konfino, Gil . | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to General Motors LLC. | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Discovery Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated. | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated. | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/17/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated. | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors. Refers to: General Motors LLC | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECLARATION OF MARLENE KRISTEN FLORES, ESQ. PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 430.41 IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Declaration - Other filed by General Motors LLC. |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/08/2019 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated. | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order for Motion Requesting Further Responses to Plaintiff's Formal Interrogatories Proposed Order (5/10/19) filed by Konfino, Gil; Next Level Motors. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.