Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of Chula Vista, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Blue, Beth D, against Swa Group, Highland Partnership Inc, represented by Benito, Edward N, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Cycle Time342 days |
Original Summons filed by City of Chula Vista. Refers to: Highland Partnership Inc
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Complaint filed by City of Chula Vista. Refers to: Highland Partnership Inc; SWA Group
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (Notice of Pending Action) filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by City of Chula Vista. Refers to: Highland Partnership Inc
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Pending Action) filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by City of Chula Vista. Refers to: SWA Group
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Highland Partnership Inc.
Date: March 14, 2019Proof of Service by Mail filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Answer filed by Highland Partnership Inc.
Date: March 14, 2019Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/22/2019 10:30:00 AM.
Date: March 22, 2019Case Management Statement filed by Highland Partnership Inc.
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by City of Chula Vista.
Date: August 12, 2019Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by Highland Partnership Inc.
Date: August 20, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.