Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kahn, Michael D, against Hollenstein, Mark ; Aka : Hollenstein, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to N-26 effective 02/16/2019.
Date: February 16, 2019Request for Dismissal of Does (DOES 1-15) filed by Synchrony Bank.
Date: March 09, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Hollenstein, Mark
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Case reassigned from N-26 to N-03 effective 01/09/2021.
Date: January 09, 2021Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Hollenstein, Mark
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Hollenstein, Mark
Date: March 16, 2021Request for Entry of Default filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Hollenstein, Mark
Date: March 09, 2021Original Summons filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Hollenstein, Mark
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Synchrony Bank. Refers to: Hollenstein, Mark
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.