Cmre Financial Services Inc,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Love, Franklin J,
against
Poppert, Stephanie,
Poppert, Tobin,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Paula S. Rosenstein presiding.
Case Details for
Cmre Financial Services Inc v. Poppert, Stephanie
, et al.
Case Events for
Cmre Financial Services Inc v. Poppert, Stephanie
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
July 15, 2022
Docket Event
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc.
January 21, 2020
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc.
November 28, 2019
Docket Event
Default entered as to Poppert, Stephanie on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc .
November 28, 2019
Docket Event
Default entered as to Poppert, Tobin on Complaint and Declaration Re: Reduced Filing Fees filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc .
November 08, 2019
Docket Event
Writ of Execution issued.
November 08, 2019
Docket Event
Writ of Execution filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Poppert, Stephanie; Poppert, Tobin
September 26, 2019
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Poppert, Stephanie; Poppert, Tobin
April 08, 2019
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Court filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc.
April 08, 2019
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for CMRE Financial Services Inc and against Poppert, Stephanie ;Poppert, Tobin for $ 891.40, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 200.00, interest: $ 141.84, prejudgment costs: $ 284.40, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 1517.64.
November 28, 2018
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (with dismissal of does and supporting declarations) filed by CMRE Financial Services Inc. Refers to: Poppert, Tobin; Poppert, Stephanie