Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Fpa Collwood Llc; Dba : Fifty Twenty-Five Apartments, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Carney, Terence P, against Collins Jr, Michael, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial178 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions150 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time359 days |
Case reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018
Date: 2018-12-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/11/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Original Summons filed by FPA Collwood LLC. Refers to: Collins, Michael
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Complaint filed by FPA Collwood LLC. Refers to: Collins, Michael
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by FPA Collwood LLC.
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00The default filed by FPA Collwood LLC was denied. Refers to: Collins, Michael
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 45]
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/08/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice - Other (Continued Case Management Conference) filed by FPA Collwood LLC.
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/15/2019 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of continued case management conference) filed by FPA Collwood LLC.
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by FPA Collwood LLC.
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 24]
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Collins, Michael
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default (Not Entered) filed by FPA Collwood LLC. Refers to: Collins, Michael
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 41]
Date: 2019-04-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by FPA Collwood LLC. Refers to: Collins, Michael
Date: 2019-05-03T00:00:00The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Collins, Michael
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Application for Entry of Judgment filed by FPA Collwood LLC.
Date: July 29, 2019Request for Entry of Default filed by FPA Collwood LLC. Refers to: Collins, Michael
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by FPA Collwood LLC.
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed by FPA Collwood LLC.
Date: September 05, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.