Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Seiler, Larry Dale, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Faualo, Tafiaiga ; Esa : Faualo, Tafianga Tuiva, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions17 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time17 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed with prejudice. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/28/2018 08:33:00 AM. | |
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Response By Mail filed by FAUALO, TAFIAIGA. Refers to: SEILER, LARRY | |
September 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders filed by FAUALO, TAFIAIGA. | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case initiation form printed. | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 09/28/2018 at 08:33:00 AM at North County in N-24 . | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order filed by SEILER, LARRY DALE. Refers to: FAUALO, TAFIAIGA | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-24. | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by SEILER, LARRY DALE. Refers to: FAUALO, TAFIAIGA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.