Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Td Bank Usa N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kirkpatrick, Mishaela J, against Chavez, Israel D, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Edlene C. McKenzie presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions213 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Service filed by TD Bank USA N A.
Date: October 02, 2018Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
Date: January 11, 2020Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 11, 2018Original Summons filed by TD Bank USA N A. Refers to: Chavez, Israel
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by TD Bank USA N A.
Date: March 23, 2021Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by TD Bank USA N A. Refers to: Chavez, Israel
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by TD Bank USA N A. Refers to: Chavez, Israel
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.