Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valles, Rudy, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Eads, Jesse James, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions45 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Due Diligence (unsuccessful) filed by Valles, Rudy. | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Court ordered the Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (Civil Harassment Prevention) dismissed without prejudice. | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/26/2018 08:30:00 AM. | |
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration of Due Diligence (unsuccessful) filed by Valles, Rudy. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Valles, Rudy. Refers to: Eads, Jesse | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 09/28/2018 08:30:00 AM. | |
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Petitioner's request to continue the Hearing on Restraining Order and reissue the temporary orders was granted. The Hearing on Restraining Order was continued to 10/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Department N-24. | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order filed by Valles, Rudy. Refers to: Eads, Jesse | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department N-24. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.