Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dugger, Linda, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bertsche, Louis J, against Traughber, Elizabeth, Hinson, Michelle, represented by Romell, Aleksandra, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with John S. Meyer presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial161 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time245 days |
Original Summons filed by Dugger, Linda. Refers to: Traughber, Elizabeth; Hinson, Michelle
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Complaint filed by Dugger, Linda. Refers to: Traughber, Elizabeth; Hinson, Michelle
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Mediator Selection Form filed by Dugger, Linda.
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/15/2019 09:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Hinson, Michelle; Traughber, Elizabeth.
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Answer filed by Hinson, Michelle; Traughber, Elizabeth.
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dugger, Linda. Refers to: Traughber, Elizabeth; Hinson, Michelle
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Statement of Agreement/Nonagreement - full agreement filed by MCINTYRE, MONTY A.
Date: April 19, 2019Case Management Statement filed by Dugger, Linda.
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Dugger, Linda.
Date: May 10, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.