Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Renty Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Salaami, Ehson, against Zako, Jonathan Stephen, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Katherine Bacal presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions239 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time260 days |
Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Renty LLC.
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Renty LLC.
Date: May 28, 2019Judgment by Default by Court filed by Renty LLC. Refers to: Zako, Jonathan
Date: May 07, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Renty LLC. Refers to: Zako, Jonathan
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Publication filed by Renty LLC. Refers to: Zako, Jonathan
Date: March 19, 2019Original Summons filed by Renty LLC. Refers to: Zako, Jonathan
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Complaint filed by Renty LLC. Refers to: Zako, Jonathan
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/29/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: March 29, 2019Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Renty LLC.
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed by Renty LLC. Refers to: Zako, Jonathan
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Declarations in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed by Renty LLC.
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Statement of Case filed by Renty LLC.
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.