Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Arellano, Suzana, Lozano, Edgar, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gomez, John H; Sizemore, Jessica, Wagner, Kacie B, against Amazon.Com Inc, Hoffman, Patrick, represented by Cole, Kammann S; Hughes, Peter M; Jafferies, Felicia P; Kinney, Christiane Cargill, Hughes, Peter M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Matthew C. Braner presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial232 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Association of Attorney filed by Amazon.com Inc.
Date: 2019-10-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Amazon.com Inc.
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Hoffman, Patrick.
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 11/04/2022 08:45:00 AM.
Date: November 04, 2022Case reassigned from Lewis,Joan to Frazier,Ronald effective 12/29/2018
Date: 2018-12-29T00:00:00Order - Other (Re Stipulation to Continue Trial and All Related Dates) filed by Hoffman, Patrick.
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Arellano, Suzana; Lozano, Edgar.
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Arellano, Suzana; Lozano, Edgar.
Date: 2019-01-24T00:00:00Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 02/08/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Notice to Litigants SD generated.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Answer filed by Amazon.com Inc.
Date: 2019-02-27T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Arellano, Suzana; Lozano, Edgar. Refers to: Amazon.com Inc; Hoffman, Patrick
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Complaint filed by Arellano, Suzana; Lozano, Edgar. Refers to: Amazon.com Inc; Hoffman, Patrick
Date: 2018-09-06T00:00:00Answer filed by Hoffman, Patrick.
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Amazon.com Inc.
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Status Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/04/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.
Date: 2021-12-09T00:00:00Case reassigned from Frazier,Ronald to Braner,Matthew effective 11/11/2021
Date: 2021-11-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Lozano, Edgar; Arellano, Suzana.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Hoffman, Patrick.
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Lozano, Edgar; Arellano, Suzana.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed by Lozano, Edgar; Arellano, Suzana.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 01/08/2021 at 09:45:00 AM in C-65 before Ronald F. Frazier at Central.
Date: 2020-05-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/19/2021 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Amazon.com Inc.
Date: 2019-04-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/26/2019 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Hoffman, Patrick.
Date: 2019-04-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 01/04/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/21/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: April 21, 2022Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents filed by Lozano, Edgar; Arellano, Suzana.
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Arellano, Suzana.
Date: December 19, 2022Proof of Service filed by Lozano, Edgar; Arellano, Suzana.
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.