Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cig Financial Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Newport, Stephanie A, against Bonales, Sandy, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Paula S. Rosenstein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by CIG Financial LLC. Refers to: Bonales, Sandy
Date: September 05, 2018Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by CIG Financial LLC. Refers to: Bonales, Sandy
Date: September 05, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by CIG Financial LLC. Refers to: Bonales, Sandy
Date: September 05, 2018Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 06, 2018Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
Date: January 11, 2020Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 03/18/2023.
Date: March 18, 2023Case reassigned from C-61 to 1402 effective 07/30/2022.
Date: July 30, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.