Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Siuguen, Christine, against Storm, Mark, represented by Walton, Jake A, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Eddie C Sturgeon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Time To Trial241 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time527 days |
Original Summons filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Storm, Mark
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Case reassigned from 903 to Eddie Sturgeon effective 10/19/2018
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Storm, Mark
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Midland Funding LLC. Refers to: Storm, Mark
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00General Denial filed by Storm, Mark.
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Storm, Mark.
Date: June 27, 2019Minutes finalized for Civil Court Trial heard 11/08/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: November 08, 2019Case Management Statement filed by Storm, Mark.
Date: 2019-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Midland Funding LLC.
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Midland Funding LLC.
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: November 13, 2019Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Midland Funding LLC.
Date: February 13, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.