Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lopez, Remedios, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case against Golden, Lisa, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS-EAR or EAF) filed by Lopez, Remedios. Refers to: Golden, Lisa | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order scheduled for 10/16/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-07 . | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Restraining order as requested against Respondent, Lisa Golden was granted. | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing on Restraining Order reassigned to for 10/16/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in S-07 at South County. | |
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Hearing on Restraining Order heard 10/16/2018 01:30:00 PM. | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Lisa Golden's Opposition to Restraining Order) filed by Golden, Lisa. Refers to: Lopez, Remedios | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse continued pursuant to party's motion to 10/16/2018 at 01:30PM in Department S-09. | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing filed by Lopez, Remedios. Refers to: Golden, Lisa | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse reassigned to for 09/25/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in S-10 at South County. | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 09/25/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at South County in S-10 . |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.