Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Satirasi Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Meads, Thomas W, against Even Stevens California Llc, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions10 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time97 days |
Request for Dismissal (Not Entered) filed by Satirasi LLC.
Date: December 10, 2018Case initiation form printed.
Date: September 04, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Satirasi LLC. Refers to: Even Stevens California LLC
Date: September 04, 2018Complaint filed by Satirasi LLC. Refers to: Even Stevens California LLC
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Writ of Possession Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed by Satirasi LLC.
Date: October 17, 2018Original Summons filed by Satirasi LLC. Refers to: Even Stevens California LLC
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Writ of Possession issued.
Date: September 21, 2018Request for Entry of Default filed by Satirasi LLC. Refers to: Even Stevens California LLC
Date: September 14, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.