Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Liyaanaarachchi, Daya, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Tucker, Joshua D, against Highsmith, Sandra K., represented by Dermody, Gerard F, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Robert F. O'Neill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Liyaanaarachchi, Daya.
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice - Other (Authorization to Appear by Telephone) filed by Highsmith, Sandra K..
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00The Small Claims Court Trial was rescheduled to 12/11/2018 at 08:00:00 AM in C-63 before at Central.
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Order, Stipulation and Oath for Temporary Judge signed and filed.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Request for Continuance of Small Claims Trial filed by Highsmith, Sandra K..
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2019-04-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Highsmith, Sandra K..
Date: August 09, 2019Substitution of Attorney filed by Liyaanaarachchi, Daya.
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 08/16/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: August 16, 2019Trial De Novo scheduled for 08/16/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 1301 Robert F. O'Neill.
Date: 2019-05-28T00:00:00Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Liyaanaarachchi, Daya.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Post-Disposition Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Highsmith, Sandra K..
Date: 2019-04-09T00:00:00Judgment on Small Claims Appeal SD generated.
Date: August 16, 2019Notice Of Appeal (Small Claims) filed by Highsmith, Sandra K.. Refers to: Liyaanaarachchi, Daya
Date: 2019-04-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 12/11/2018 08:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Liyaanaarachchi, Daya. Refers to: Highsmith, Sandra
Date: September 25, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Liyaanaarachchi, Daya. Refers to: Highsmith, Sandra | |
August 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver, filed by Highsmith, Sandra K., on 04/09/2019, has expired. | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 08/16/2019 09:00:00 AM. |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | The Court enters judgment on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court for Daya Liyaanaarachchi and against Sandra K. Highsmith in the amount of: $4539.68 principal, $0 punitive damages, $0 attorney fees, $0 interest, $90.00 prejudgment costs and $0 other costs. Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure, Section 685.010, interest accrues at the rate of of 10% per annum on the principal amount of a money judgment remaining unsatisfied. | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment entered against Daya Liyaanaarachchi, Sandra K. Highsmith on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court vacated. | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Case remanded to the Small Claims Court for enforcement of judgment. | |
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment on Small Claims Appeal SD generated. | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by Highsmith, Sandra K.. | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (PARTY NOW IN PRO PERSONA) filed by Liyaanaarachchi, Daya. | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney filed by Liyaanaarachchi, Daya. Refers to: Tucker, Joshua |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.