Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fleischman, Jesse M, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Rivera, D Briana; Shackelford, Patricia A, against San Diego State University Foundation; Dba : San Diego State University Research Foundation, represented by Baisch, Kenneth W; Blen, Berta A., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Kenneth J Medel presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 06, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial224 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time592 days |
Proof of Service filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fleischman, Jesse M. Refers to: San Diego State University Foundation
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Reply filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice - Other (Notice of Demurrer) filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Fleischman, Jesse M. Refers to: San Diego State University Foundation
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Demurrer filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Complaint filed by Fleischman, Jesse M. Refers to: San Diego State University Foundation
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-07-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Kenneth W. Baisch) filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by Fleischman, Jesse M.
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 07/27/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Answer filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 35]
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-10-11T00:00:00Order - Other filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Fleischman, Jesse M.
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Offer to Compromise and Notice of Acceptance filed by Fleischman, Jesse M.
Date: September 18, 2019Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 08/24/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by San Diego State University Foundation.
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: November 19, 2019Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/11/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: September 11, 2019Minutes finalized for Demurrer / Motion to Strike heard 08/10/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 08/23/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Amended Complaint (First) filed by Fleischman, Jesse M. Refers to: San Diego State University Foundation
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Opposition - Other (Supplemental Opposition to Demurrer) filed by Fleischman, Jesse M.
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Fleischman, Jesse M.
Date: 2018-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: September 26, 2019Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/16/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: September 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Discovery Hearing scheduled for 01/17/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel was vacated. | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Jury Trial set for 10/11/2019 at 9:00 am vacated. | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated. | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) set for 9/27/2019 at 9:30 am vacated. | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized. |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
California Code of Civil Procedure Section 998 Offer to Compromise Offer to Compromise and Notice of Acceptance filed by Fleischman, Jesse M. |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 09/11/2019 08:30:00 AM. |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte scheduled for 09/11/2019 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.