Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Catanzarite, Kenneth filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 04, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions663 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/25/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 03/08/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 336]
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2022-03-08T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 03/10/2022 02:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/11/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/25/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-03-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 04/07/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2022-04-04T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Civil Jury Trial published.
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 09/25/2020 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 1]
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 2]
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00[A document for ROA# 3]
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for SLAPP / SLAPPback Motion Hearing heard 06/15/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for SLAPP / SLAPPback Motion Hearing heard 06/22/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 09/28/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-09-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Chronological SD generated.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Default filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Lois Mason Thompson CSR no. 3685) filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Filing filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-09-13T00:00:00Receipt of Reporter's Transcript filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-11-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Sovereign Capital Management Group Inc.
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Disbursement of Clerk's Trust Fund filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Completion of the Record on Appeal SD generated.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 04/26/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Receipt for Record on Appeal filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/01/2019 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Sovereign Strategic Mortgage Fund LLC.
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Market Tower Partners LLC.
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 02/20/2020 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Daymark Properties Realty Inc.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Sovereign Capital Management Group Inc.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/21/2020 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by White, William.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Sovereign Strategic Mortgage Fund LLC.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Daymark Realty Advisors Inc.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Market Tower Partners LLC.
Date: 2020-09-24T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 114]
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2020-11-17T00:00:00Motion - Other (for issuance of order taking motion to compel off calendar) filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/10/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/24/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 01/08/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Daymark Properties Realty Inc.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/05/2021 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Discovery Hearing published.
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 10/22/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 09/09/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 175]
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/06/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/13/2022 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00Motion for Bifurcation filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 04/22/2022 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00Reply filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Amended Motion filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (OF ADAM T. KENT) filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 05/06/2022 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Joint Trial Readiness Conference Report filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 420]
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 11/03/2022 03:00:00 PM.
Date: 2022-11-03T00:00:00Notice - Other filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 04/29/2022 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2022-04-29T00:00:00Reply filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-05-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-07-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/10/2022 03:00:00 PM.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 07/21/2022 03:00:00 PM.
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion to Quash (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-06-08T00:00:00Response filed by Mikles, Todd A.
Date: 2022-07-19T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 11/14/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-11-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.