We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Oportun Inc. ,
filed a(n)
General Small Claims -
Small Claims
case
against
Camargo, Jesus Puente ,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
March 21, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 28, 2021
Practice Area
Small Claims
Filing Location
San Diego County, CA
Matter Type
General Small Claims
Case Events for
Oportun Inc. v. Camargo, Jesus Puente
Date
Type
Description
May 08, 2018
Docket Event
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Camargo, Jesus Puente .
May 08, 2018
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Oportun Inc.. Refers to: Camargo, Jesus
Get Document
May 08, 2018
Docket Event
Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) filed by Oportun Inc..
Get Document
May 08, 2018
Docket Event
Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court dismissed without prejudice as to Oportun Inc..
May 08, 2018
Docket Event
Small Claims Court Trial scheduled for 06/14/2018 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 was vacated.
April 14, 2018
Docket Event
Small Claims Court Trial reassigned to for 06/14/2018 at 08:00:00 AM in C-63 at Central.
April 14, 2018
Docket Event
Case reassigned from C-62 to C-63 effective 04/14/2018.
April 11, 2018
Docket Event
Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Substitute filed by Oportun Inc.. Refers to: Camargo, Jesus
Get Document
March 21, 2018
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD Case initiation form printed.
Get Document
March 21, 2018
Docket Event
Case assigned to Department C-62.
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.