Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Guertin, Rebecca, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Longway, Jack, Longway, Gregory, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Robert F. O'Neill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2019 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Notice Of Appeal (Small Claims) filed by Longway, Gregory. Refers to: GUERTIN, REBECCA; Longway, Jack
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Application and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA #20) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Post-Disposition Order on Court Fee Waiver (As to Jack Longway) filed by Longway, Jack.
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 06/05/2018 01:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Post-Disposition Order on Court Fee Waiver (As to Gregory Longway) filed by Longway, Gregory.
Date: 2018-07-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Longway, Gregory.
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Application and Order Correcting Court Record (ROA #19) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial De Novo heard 11/02/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: November 02, 2018Trial De Novo scheduled for 11/02/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in 1301 Robert F. O'Neill.
Date: 2018-09-15T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: January 30, 2019Judgment on Small Claims Appeal SD generated.
Date: November 02, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: 2018-08-16T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.
Date: November 28, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.