Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Albright, Chad, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Morgan, Timothy, against The Crosby Center, San Diego Healthcare Services, Nsi Services Llc; Dba : The Crosby Center Llc, Dream Catcher Detox Center Inc, Burzynski, Lawrence ; Aka : Burns, Lawrence;Aka : Burns, Larry, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Jacqueline M. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial393 days |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Complaint filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 7]
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Burzynski, Lawrence; The Crosby Center.
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00General Denial filed by Burzynski, Lawrence; The Crosby Center.
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Answer filed by SAN DIEGO HEALTHCARE SERVICES.
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/05/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Answer filed by DREAM CATCHER DETOX CENTER INC.
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Answer filed by NSI SERVICES LLC.
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Burzynski, Lawrence; The Crosby Center.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/18/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Order to Appear SD generated.
Date: 2019-01-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/15/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Reply filed by Burzynski, Lawrence.
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/16/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record (8/16/19) filed by Burzynski, Lawrence.
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Proposed Order (8/16/19) filed by Burzynski, Lawrence.
Date: 2019-07-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Burzynski, Lawrence.
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Robberson, Mary R.
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Non-Sanction heard 10/11/2019 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (03/06/2020) filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00OSC - Non-Sanction scheduled for 10/11/2019 at 09:15:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (03/06/2020) filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/31/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Proposed Order (03/06/2020) submitted by Albright, Chad received but not filed on 02/04/2020.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 12/13/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Burzynski, Lawrence.
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Proposed Order (12/13/2019) filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (12/13/2019) filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (12/13/2019) filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00Motion to Deem Facts Admitted (03/06/2020) filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/06/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 03/06/2020 01:30:00 PM. (As Amended)
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (6/4) filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: May 29, 2020Proof of Service filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 06/04/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: June 04, 2020Proof of Service (09/18/2020) filed by Albright, Chad.
Date: August 14, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.