Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Saco, Raghed Shaba, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Morton, Eric D, against Yousif, Hasim, Yousif, Ansam, Natilda, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Timothy M. Casserly presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Time To Trial156 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time321 days |
Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Saco, Raghed Shaba.
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Saco, Raghed Shaba.
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Saco, Raghed Shaba.
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Answer filed by Yousif, Hasim.
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by Saco, Raghed Shaba.
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Saco, Raghed Shaba.
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Saco, Raghed Shaba.
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/06/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Saco, Raghed Shaba.
Date: December 18, 2018Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: December 13, 2018Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Saco, Raghed Shaba.
Date: December 18, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.