Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Express Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Michael, Lina M, against Saratoga Homes Llc, Young, Fred J; Aka : Young, Fred;Aka : Young, Fred Joseph, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior with Paula S. Rosenstein presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Original Summons filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Young, Fred; Saratoga Homes LLC
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by American Express Bank FSB.
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by American Express Bank FSB. Refers to: Young, Fred; Saratoga Homes LLC
Date: 2018-01-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (CCP 1033) filed by American Express Bank FSB.
Date: January 12, 2021Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by American Express Bank FSB.
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Lien filed by American Express Bank FSB.
Date: March 15, 2022Case reassigned from 903 to C-61 effective 01/11/2020.
Date: 2020-01-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.