Credit Corp Solutions Inc Asassignee Of Synchrony Bank; Aka : Ge Captial Retail Bank,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Jensen, Casey M,
against
Lopez, Morningstar ; Aka : Lopez, Morningstar D,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
.
Case Details for
Credit Corp Solutions Inc Asassignee Of Synchrony Bank; Aka : Ge Captial Retail Bank v. Lopez, Morningstar ; Aka : Lopez, Morningstar D
Parties for
Credit Corp Solutions Inc Asassignee Of Synchrony Bank; Aka : Ge Captial Retail Bank v. Lopez, Morningstar ; Aka : Lopez, Morningstar D
Plaintiffs
Credit Corp Solutions Inc Asassignee Of Synchrony Bank; Aka : Ge Captial Retail Bank
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Jensen, Casey M
Defendants
Lopez, Morningstar ; Aka : Lopez, Morningstar D
Case Documents for
Credit Corp Solutions Inc Asassignee Of Synchrony Bank; Aka : Ge Captial Retail Bank v. Lopez, Morningstar ; Aka : Lopez, Morningstar D
Case Events for
Credit Corp Solutions Inc Asassignee Of Synchrony Bank; Aka : Ge Captial Retail Bank v. Lopez, Morningstar ; Aka : Lopez, Morningstar D
Date
Type
Description
May 28, 2019
Docket Event
Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC ASASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK.
September 18, 2018
Docket Event
Writ of Execution issued.
September 17, 2018
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC ASASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK.
September 17, 2018
Docket Event
Writ of Execution submitted by CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC ASASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK received but not filed on 09/17/2018.
August 02, 2018
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC ASASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK and against LOPEZ, MORNINGSTAR for $ 2782.82, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 2782.82.
August 02, 2018
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Court filed by CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC ASASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: LOPEZ, MORNINGSTAR
May 29, 2018
Docket Event
Default entered as to LOPEZ, MORNINGSTAR on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC ASASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK .
May 29, 2018
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (and Supporting Declarations and Dismissal of Does) filed by CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC ASASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: LOPEZ, MORNINGSTAR
January 26, 2018
Docket Event
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (as to Morningstar Lopez) filed by CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC ASASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK. Refers to: LOPEZ, MORNINGSTAR
January 16, 2018
Docket Event
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD Case initiation form printed.