Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Citibank Na,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Jensen, Casey M,
against
Kalica, Deeann K; Aka : Kalica, Deeann,
in the jurisdiction of San Diego County.
This case was filed in
San Diego County
Superior Courts
Superior with Edlene C. McKenzie presiding.
Case Details for
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Citibank Na v. Kalica, Deeann K; Aka : Kalica, Deeann
Case Events for
Cavalry Spv I Llc As Assignee Of Citibank Na v. Kalica, Deeann K; Aka : Kalica, Deeann
Date
Type
Description
July 24, 2020
Docket Event
Writ of Execution issued.
July 23, 2020
Docket Event
Writ of Execution submitted by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA received but not filed on 07/23/2020.
July 23, 2020
Docket Event
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA.
August 16, 2019
Docket Event
Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA and against KALICA, DEEANN K for $ 3968.61, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 300.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 4268.61.
August 16, 2019
Docket Event
Judgment by Default by Court filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA. Refers to: KALICA, DEEANN
June 18, 2019
Docket Event
***Court Default Judgment Received***
June 18, 2019
Docket Event
Default entered as to KALICA, DEEANN K on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA .
June 18, 2019
Docket Event
Request for Entry of Default (with Supporting Documents) filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA. Refers to: KALICA, DEEANN
November 15, 2018
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD The default filed by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA was denied. Refers to: KALICA, DEEANN
November 15, 2018
Docket Event
Notice to Filing Party SD Judgment by Default by Court submitted by Cavalry SPV I LLC as assignee of Citibank NA rejected on 11/15/2018.