Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pacific Bay Gardens Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mckinley, James R, against Brower, Grey, Reeves, Michelle, represented by Curry, Christian A M, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2018 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions35 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time96 days |
Request for Entry of Default of Unnamed Tenants (UNKNOWNS DEFAULTED) filed by Pacific Bay Gardens LLC.
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pacific Bay Gardens LLC. Refers to: Reeves, Michelle; Brower, Grey
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-07 to C-60 effective 01/12/2018.
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver filed by Brower, Grey.
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Request to Set Case for Trial (At Issue Memorandum) filed by Pacific Bay Gardens LLC.
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Writ of Possession issued.
Date: February 20, 2018Substitution of Attorney filed by Reeves, Michelle.
Date: February 09, 2018Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: February 02, 2018Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Pacific Bay Gardens LLC.
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Pacific Bay Gardens LLC. Refers to: Reeves, Michelle; Brower, Grey
Date: 2018-01-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Brower, Grey.
Date: February 09, 2018Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted) filed by Reeves, Michelle.
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00Answer filed by Brower, Grey; Reeves, Michelle.
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.