Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Perez, Rosemary, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Martir, Cathy, Ocegueda, Jorge, represented by Case, Anthony T, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 08, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial322 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions542 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/31/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-01-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Timothy M Workman) filed by OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Answer filed by Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Sign-in Sheet) filed by PEREZ, ROSEMARY.
Date: 2018-09-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/26/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-10-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by PEREZ, ROSEMARY. Refers to: Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Original Summons filed by PEREZ, ROSEMARY. Refers to: Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE received but not filed on 04/11/2019.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Timothy M Workman) filed by Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Complaint filed by PEREZ, ROSEMARY. Refers to: Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by PEREZ, ROSEMARY.
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/22/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by OCEGUEDA, JORGE received but not filed on 12/21/2018.
Date: 2018-12-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/18/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 01/25/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions filed by Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: 2019-04-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 05/10/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Martir, CATHY; OCEGUEDA, JORGE.
Date: June 14, 2019Judgment of Dismissal filed by Martir, CATHY.
Date: June 03, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.