Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cruz, Brian, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Geyman, Douglas E, against Rivas, Rudy, Joyce, John Steven, Inventory Control Services Inc; Dba : Tier 1 Solutions, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Richard S. Whitney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Complaint filed by Cruz, Brian. Refers to: Inventory Control Services Inc; Joyce, John; Rivas, Rudy
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Joyce, John Steven; Inventory Control Services Inc.
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cruz, Brian.
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Joyce, John Steven.
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/20/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Inventory Control Services Inc.
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/06/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/11/2018 10:30:00 AM. (As Amended)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Joyce, John Steven; Inventory Control Services Inc.
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: May 29, 2018Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/25/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-05-25T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/22/2018 09:30:00 AM.
Date: June 22, 2018Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-05-29T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 06/08/2018 09:30:00 AM.
Date: June 08, 2018Case reassigned from Hayes,Judith to Whitney,Richard effective 11/10/2018
Date: November 10, 2018Notice of Related Case filed by Cruz, Brian.
Date: June 06, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.