Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Tang, Jason W, against Graison, Steve H, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Katherine Bacal presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 21, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions234 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time552 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Graison, Steve
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Graison, Steve
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 17]
Date: December 27, 2017Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Graison, Steve
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Original Summons filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Graison, Steve
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Declaration of Non-Service (as to Steve H Graison) filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Graison, Steve
Date: 2017-09-15T00:00:00General Denial filed by Graison, Steve H.
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Case reassigned from C-27 to Katherine Bacal effective 12/11/2017
Date: December 11, 2017Case reassigned from C-07 to C-27 effective 09/23/2017.
Date: 2017-09-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (DENIED) filed by Graison, Steve H.
Date: December 11, 2017Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Discover Bank. Refers to: Graison, Steve
Date: March 14, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.