Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Allen Md, Richard Todd, Cava Md, Noli, Cook Denmark Holding Aps, Cook Denmark International Aps, Cook Group Europe Aps, (total of 10) See All represented by Fessinger, Robert B, Laddon, Tarifa B., Rosa, Stephen Allen, in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Joel R. Wohlfeil presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoel R. Wohlfeil Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial182 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions971 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Cycle Time971 days |
Notice of Hearing (of Case Management Conference) filed by Kay, Christine.
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Order Remanding Case to Originating Court (to State Court) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial filed by Regents of the University of California; Allen MD, Richard Todd.
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Answer filed by Regents of the University of California; Allen MD, Richard Todd.
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Answer filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Answer filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2017-08-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Kay, Christine.
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Regents of the University of California; Allen MD, Richard Todd.
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Kay, Christine.
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Pertinent Dates) filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/08/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Robert Tung-Hsing Wang, PH.D. M.D.) filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2018-05-08T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 11/16/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 12/07/2018 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Order (ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE DENIED) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Regents of the University of California.
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Regents of the University of California.
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 11/22/2019 10:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Advance Trial Review Order filed by Kay, Christine; Regents of the University of California.
Date: 2019-11-22T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine (MIL 9 of 9 To limit expert testimony offered by the Pltf) filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2020-01-06T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00Opposition to Motion in Limine (Oppo to MIL 1) filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Point Loma Rehabilitation Center LLC.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/16/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Regina Garrison CSR no. 12921) filed by Kay, Christine.
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/14/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/21/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/15/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-15T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/04/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/03/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/30/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/22/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/23/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement and Supporting Documents filed by Cava MD, Noli.
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/27/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-27T00:00:00Trial Brief (Brief re: CACI 413) filed by Regents of the University of California.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Trial Brief (Re CACI 514) filed by Regents of the University of California.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/29/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00Trial Brief (Brief re: CACI 532) filed by Regents of the University of California.
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 02/05/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Jury Trial heard 01/28/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Motion - Other (for Attorney Fees) filed by Kay, Christine.
Date: March 06, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Kay, Christine.
Date: May 26, 2020Verdict filed by Kay, Christine; Regents of the University of California.
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00Objections filed by Regents of the University of California; Allen MD, Richard Todd.
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: May 28, 2020Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: July 28, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.