Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Burks-Thomas, Mollie; Karaguezian, Tamar; Nguyen, Sally Trung filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald L. Styn presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial360 days |
Last RefreshedMay 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Complaint filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc. Refers to: US Security Associates Inc; Staff Pro Inc
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed by Staff Pro Inc; US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Answer filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2017-06-15T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2017-04-11T00:00:00Answer filed by Staff Pro Inc; US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 08/15/2017 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2017-10-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Staff Pro Inc; US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Staff Pro Inc; US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/06/2017 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment SD generated.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 01/05/2018 08:31:00 AM.
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 11/17/2017 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Staff Pro Inc; US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings submitted by US Security Associates Inc rejected on 01/23/2018.
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/06/2018 08:29:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2018-04-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/09/2018 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 04/06/2018 08:29:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Related Case (2016-13068) filed by Staff Pro Inc.
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 04/13/2018 08:29:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-13T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 90]
Date: 2018-06-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Staff Pro Inc; US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Staff Pro Inc; US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice filed by Staff Pro Inc; US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 08/17/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/09/2018 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00E-filing transaction partially accepted.
Date: 2019-09-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by Staff Pro Inc.
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Staff Pro Inc.
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by Staff Pro Inc.
Date: 2019-09-25T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 12/12/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 11/21/2019 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2019-12-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion to be Relieved as Counsel filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (exhibits on motion) filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2020-01-02T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/10/2020 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2019-12-18T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 01/03/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 02/21/2020 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 03/06/2020 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00Reply filed by US Security Associates Inc.
Date: 2018-08-09T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to order to show cause re sanctions) filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 02/21/2020 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney submitted by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc rejected on 06/16/2020.
Date: 2020-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Maria C. Ramirez) filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: September 08, 2020Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 07/07/2020 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Civil Jury Trial rescheduled to 11/06/2020 at 09:30:00 AM in C-74 before Ronald L. Styn at Central.
Date: 2020-05-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference (Civil) heard 02/07/2020 11:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2020-06-26T00:00:00Opposition - Other (to motion for summary judgment) filed by Odyssey Unlimited Security Inc.
Date: 2020-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2020-02-21T00:00:00Reply (in support of its motion for summary judgment) filed by Staff Pro Inc.
Date: August 19, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.