Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
City Of San Diego filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Richard S. Whitney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1259 days |
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1259 days |
Answer filed by San Diego Civil Service Commission; City Of San Diego.
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Minutes finalized for OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed heard 11/03/2017 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 04/24/2018 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Meoli, Michael.
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Meoli, Michael.
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Meoli, Michael.
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Meoli, Michael.
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Reply filed by Meoli, Michael.
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling filed by San Diego Civil Service Commission; City Of San Diego.
Date: 2018-08-01T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Hearing on Petition heard 07/27/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Meoli, Michael.
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Notice RE: Fee for Record on Appeal (D074758) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2018-11-13T00:00:00Case reassigned from Hayes,Judith to Whitney,Richard effective 11/10/2018
Date: 2018-11-10T00:00:00Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Alphabetical SD generated.
Date: January 29, 2019Receipt for Record on Appeal (File Copy, D074758) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: January 29, 2019Remittitur filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: June 23, 2020Notice of Completion of the Record on Appeal SD generated.
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Chronological SD generated.
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice of Default filed by The Superior Court of San Diego. Refers to: Meoli, Michael
Date: 2018-10-25T00:00:00Receipt of Reporter's Transcript (Cynthia J. Vega, D074758) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Record on Appeal Civil Case Index Form -Chronological SD generated.
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Disbursement of Clerk's Trust Fund (D074758) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.
Date: 2019-01-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: June 23, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.