Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Melzer, Victoria, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Rubin, David J, against Melzer, James Edward, Bj'S Equipment Rentals, Inc., in the jurisdiction of San Diego County. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts with Ronald F. Frazier presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 16, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial172 days |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions261 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Diego County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time571 days |
Original Summons filed by Melzer, Victoria. Refers to: BJ's Equipment Rentals, Inc.
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Case initiation form printed.
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Complaint filed by Melzer, Victoria. Refers to: BJ's Equipment Rentals, Inc.; BJ's Rentals, Inc.
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Melzer, Victoria. Refers to: BJ's Equipment Rentals, Inc.
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Original Summons filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Answer filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2016-07-28T00:00:00Answer filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc.. Refers to: MELZER, JAMES
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc.. Refers to: MELZER, JAMES
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2016-11-15T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2016-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing SD generated.
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 12/05/2016 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (5/5/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (5/5/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Declaration - Other (5/5/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Case reassigned from Dahlquist,Robert to Frazier,Ronald effective 03/04/2017
Date: 2017-03-04T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (5/5/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (5/5/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Proposed Order (6/16/17) submitted by BJ's Equipment Rentals, Inc. received but not filed on 03/29/2017.
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (06/30/2017) filed by BJ's Equipment Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (06/30/2017) filed by BJ's Equipment Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication (6/16/17) filed by BJ's Equipment Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-04-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (5/5/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Proposed Order (06/30/2017) filed by BJ's Equipment Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (6/30 SUMMARY ADJUDICATION) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (6/16/17) filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (6/16/17) filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Discovery Hearing heard 05/05/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Notice - Other (06/16/17-AMENDED NOTICE OF LODGMENT) filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition - Other (6/16/17) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (Amended 6/16/17) filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 80]
Date: 2017-06-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other (6/16/17) filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (6/16/17) filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (6/16/17) filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-06-02T00:00:00Declaration - Other (6/16/17) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (10/5/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (6/30/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (6/16/17) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 06/30/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (6/30/17) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (6/30/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (6/30/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (6/30/17) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Proposed Order (6/30/17) submitted by BJ's Rentals, Inc. received but not filed on 06/23/2017.
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00[Another document for ROA# 107]
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (10/5/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (6/30/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Response (6/16/17) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Objections (6/30/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Objections (6/16/17) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (6/30/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Objections (6/30/17) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00Proposed Order (6/16/17) submitted by BJ's Rentals, Inc. received but not filed on 06/09/2017.
Date: 2017-06-09T00:00:00Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) heard 06/16/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Advance Trial Review Order filed by BJ's Equipment Rentals, Inc.; Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Lodgment (6/30/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-06-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (10/05/2017) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Opposition - Other (10/5/17) filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 09/29/2017 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (10/05/2017) filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Proposed Order (10/5/17) submitted by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD received but not filed on 10/04/2017.
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Proposed Order submitted by BJ's Rentals, Inc. received but not filed on 10/05/2017.
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.
Date: October 12, 2017Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Melzer, Victoria.
Date: October 10, 2017Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 10/05/2017 08:30:00 AM.
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Proof of Service filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Trial Brief filed by MELZER, JAMES EDWARD.
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed by BJ's Rentals, Inc..
Date: January 08, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.